Barlow v. Ebbert et al

Plaintiff: Camden Barlow
Defendant: Officer/Counselor Tharp, Warden David J. Ebbert and SIS Officer Buebendorf
Case Number: 1:2018cv01963
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Harrisburg Office
0 Judge: RM
1 Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting pltf's mtn for exttm #12 . Pltf's amended complaint due by 1/3/2019.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 12/4/18. (ma)
November 13, 2018 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint by Camden Barlow.(ao)
October 22, 2018 11 Letter from LP with copies of Docs. 8 and 9 and correction of inmate's ID number as per SA. (lp)
October 19, 2018 10 Mail (Pro se letter) sent to Camden Barlow returned as "WRONG INMATE NUMBER" - no other number on file. No match on Vinelink. (pjr)
October 11, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)ORDER: In accord with the accompanying Memorandum 89 ; 1. Pltfs mtn for a TRO and PI 2 ), is DENIED;2. Pltf Wilsons mtn pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 201 63, is DENIED as moot;3. Pltf Raileys mtn for leave to file an amended complaint 65, is DENIED without prejudice;4. Pltf Raileys mtn for reconsideration 68, is DENIED;5. Pltf Raileys mtn to sever party from action 81, is GRANTED as follows:a. The claims of Pltf Nathan Railey will proceed under this matter, No. 18-cv-716;b. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to open the claims of Pltfs Camden Barlow, Christopher Alvarez, Terrell Wilson, Doreteo Garcia, and Juan C. Valles in new, individual actions. The original filing date of Pltfs claims will be preserved; c. The complaint (Doc. No. 1), the respective prisoner authorization forms and administrative orders (Doc. Nos. 10, 20, 22, 34, 37, 43-45, 47, 48), waivers of service forms (Doc. Nos. 40, 55), and copy of this Memorandum and Order will be docketed in each individual Pltfs action;d. Each Pltf shall file an amended complaint within (30) days from the date of this Order. If a Pltf fails to file an amended complaint within the time prescribed herein, the Court will direct Dfts to respond to the remaining FirstAmendment mail interference/enhancement claim as set forth in the original complaint (Doc. No. 1); and6. Dfts mtn to stay the proceedings 83, is DENIED as moot.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/10/18.(pjr) Modified on 10/11/2018 (pjr).
October 11, 2018 8 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry): MEMORANDUM re mtns to Sever 81, to Stay 83, pursuant to Federal Rule 63, for TRO 2, for Leave to File amended cmplnt 65, for Reconsideration 68, (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/10/18. (pjr)
October 11, 2018 7 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER sent to Prison Superintendent/Warden, plaintiff and financial.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/11/18. (pjr)
October 11, 2018 6 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 waiver)(pjr)
October 11, 2018 5 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account. (pjr)
October 11, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Camden Barlow.(pjr)
October 11, 2018 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties of their briefing and other responsibilities.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/11/18. (pjr)
October 11, 2018 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (pjr)
October 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT was originally lodged on 4/2/18 and deemed filed when IFP was granted on 7/24/18, filed by Camden Barlow.(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barlow v. Ebbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer/Counselor Tharp
Represented By: Justin Blewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden David J. Ebbert
Represented By: Justin Blewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIS Officer Buebendorf
Represented By: Justin Blewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camden Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?