Lopez v. LivaNova Deutschland GmbH et al

Plaintiff: Armando Lopez
Defendant: Sorin Group USA Inc. and Livanova Deutschland GMBH
Case Number: 1:2018cv01978
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case is associated with Master MDL 2816 - assigned in our court at 1:18-MD-2816. (dmn)
October 12, 2018 12 Case transferred electronically in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:18-cv-62222 containing electronic documents. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 12, 2018 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-23) transferring case to the Middle District of Pennsylvania re: MDL 2816 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable John E. Jones, III. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/12/2018.]
September 24, 2018 10 Featured Case Administrative Order Closing Case. This case is related to Multidistrict Litigation pending in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/24/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/12/2018.]
September 24, 2018 9 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Status Conference held on 9/24/2018. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 10 minutes. Jason Jovine. Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ado) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/12/2018.]
September 21, 2018 8 Summons Issued as to LivaNova Deutschland GmbH, Sorin Group USA, Inc.. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/12/2018.]
September 20, 2018 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) For All Defendants by Armando Lopez (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (McMullen, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/12/2018.]
September 20, 2018 6 NOTICE by Armando Lopez of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (McMullen, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/12/2018.]
September 19, 2018 5 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/24/2018 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. The parties may appear by phone and are instructed to call 1-888-684-8852 on the date and time set forth above. The access code is 3156459 and the password is 5510. FOR CLARITY, PLEASE DO NOT USE A CELL PHONE OR A SPEAKER PHONE. (ps1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/12/2018.]
September 19, 2018 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (lh) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/12/2018.]
September 19, 2018 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/12/2018.]
September 19, 2018 2 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (lh) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/12/2018.]
September 19, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11007865, filed by Armando Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McMullen, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 10/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. LivaNova Deutschland GmbH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Lopez
Represented By: Michael James McMullen
Represented By: Bradford M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livanova Deutschland GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?