Press and Journal, Inc. v. Borough of Middletown

Plaintiff: Press and Journal, Inc.
Defendant: Borough of Middletown
Case Number: 1:2018cv02064
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #28 Brief in Opposition filed by Borough of Middletown of Affiant Kenneth Klinepeter. (Stewart, Mark)
December 21, 2018 Filing 28 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Borough of Middletown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Mark)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - AND NOW, this 13th day of December, 2018, upon consideration of the motion (Doc. 12) to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) filed by defendant Borough of Middletown (the Borough), and for the reasons stated in the accompanying memorandum, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Boroughs motion (Doc. 12) to dismiss is DENIED insofar as it is grounded in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). 2. The Borough shall file its brief in opposition to plaintiffs motion (Doc. 5) for a preliminary injunction on or before Friday, December 21, 2018. Plaintiff may file a reply within fourteen (14) days of the date on which the Borough serves its brief in opposition. See LOCAL RULE 7.7.3. As previously ordered, (see Doc. 23 3), the parties shall meet and confer and provide proposed preliminary injunction hearing dates to the court as soon as practicable.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/13/18. (dmn)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) - See Memorandum for Further Details.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/13/18. (dmn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Borough of Middletown.(Skjoldal, Kevin)
November 28, 2018 Filing 24 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss] filed by Press and Journal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Aaron)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltf shall file br in opp to deft's MTD #12 by 11/28/18 (see order for limiting instructions) & deft may file reply by 12/5/18.; 2. Deft's ddl to respond to pltf's motion #5 for prelim inj STAYED until further order... if necessary following ct's detmination of MTD.; 3. Deft's motion #11 to continue granted only insofar as prelim inj hrg set for 11/20/18 CANCELLED & will be rescheduled if necessary following ct's determination of MTD w/ parties directed to meet & confer & provide proposed hearing dates to ct as soon as practicable. (See order for coplete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/26/18. (ki)
November 16, 2018 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Attend and Testify at Hearing served on Angela Lloyd on 11/12/18, filed by Press and Journal, Inc.. (Martin, Aaron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Attend and Testify at Hearing served on Dawn Knull on 11/12/18, filed by Press and Journal, Inc.. (Martin, Aaron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Attend and Testify at Hearing served on Ian Reddinger on 11/12/18, filed by Press and Journal, Inc.. (Martin, Aaron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Attend and Testify at Hearing served on Mike Woodworth on 11/12/18, filed by Press and Journal, Inc.. (Martin, Aaron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Attend and Testify at Hearing served on Damon Suglia on 11/12/18, filed by Press and Journal, Inc.. (Martin, Aaron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Attend and Testify at Hearing served on James Curry, III on 11/12/18, filed by Press and Journal, Inc.. (Martin, Aaron)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Attend and Testify at Hearing served on Jenny Miller on 11/12/18, filed by Press and Journal, Inc.. (Martin, Aaron)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's Motion for Continuance by Press and Journal, Inc.. #11 MOTION to Continue . (Attachments: #1 Press Release, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Aaron)
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Borough of Middletown.(Skjoldal, Kevin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Borough of Middletown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Skjoldal, Kevin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue by Borough of Middletown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Skjoldal, Kevin)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed 11.6.18 by Counsel for Defendant in his own right and on behalf of Defendant (Scheduling Order) Acknowledgement filed by Press and Journal, Inc.. (Martin, Aaron)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Stewart on behalf of All Defendants (Stewart, Mark)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Skjoldal on behalf of Borough of Middletown (Skjoldal, Kevin)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER directing deft to file br in opp of motion #5 for preliminary injuncition by noon on 11/16/18, setting HEARING on motion #5 for 11/20/18 @ 1:30 p.m. in Ctrm #2, 9th Floor, Harrisburg before Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner, & directing cnsl for pltf to immediately effect svc of this order upon deft & when ID'd, deft's cnsl w/ cnsl to forthwith provide court w/ proof of svc of this order when svc is effected. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/5/18. (ki)
November 3, 2018 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Press and Journal, Inc..(Martin, Aaron)
November 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Press and Journal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #3 Proposed Order)(Martin, Aaron)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Press and Journal, Inc.. Borough of Middletown served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Martin, Aaron)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 10/26/18. (ki)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Borough of Middletown and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Borough of Middletown (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4580157), filed by Press and Journal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Press and Journal, Inc. v. Borough of Middletown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Press and Journal, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Reed
Represented By: Veronica L Boyer
Represented By: Aaron D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borough of Middletown
Represented By: Kevin M. Skjoldal
Represented By: Mark S. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?