Thomas v. Public Partnerships, LLC
Plaintiff: Irma Thomas
Defendant: Public Partnerships, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02084
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - AND NOW, to wit, this 21st day of December, 2018, uponconsideration of Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitin Local Civil Rule 7.8(b), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the said Motion begranted. Defendant may file a brief in support of its Motion for SummaryJudgment not to exceed 40 pages.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 12/21/2018. (dmn)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Public Partnerships, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Lindsey)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Walter Foster, Esq. on behalf of Dft.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 11/8/18. (ma)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Irma Thomas. Public Partnerships, LLC waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Weisberg, Larry)
November 8, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Walter Foster and Associate Counsel Lindsey Conrad Kennedy - bar status verified. (dmn)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Walter M Foster on behalf of Public Partnerships, LLC Attorney Walter Foster is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4594837.. (Foster, Walter)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Conrad Kennedy on behalf of All Defendants (Kennedy, Lindsey)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/LETTER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/31/18. (ma)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Public Partnerships, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Public Partnerships, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4584024), filed by Irma Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Public Partnerships, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Partnerships, LLC
Represented By: Walter M Foster
Represented By: Lindsey Conrad Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Thomas
Represented By: Derrek William Cummings
Represented By: Stephen Todd Mahan, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen P. Gunther
Represented By: Larry A. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?