Vineyard v. Schenker, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Stacey E. Vineyard
Defendant: Schenker, Inc. and Aerotek, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02087
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by Aerotek, Inc..(Marsh, Lucille)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Stacey E. Vineyard. Aerotek, Inc. waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Weisberg, Larry)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schenker, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schenker Americas, Inc. for Schenker, Inc... (Ludwig, Steven)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven K. Ludwig on behalf of Schenker, Inc. (Ludwig, Steven)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4584297), filed by Stacey E. Vineyard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vineyard v. Schenker, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schenker, Inc.
Represented By: Steven K. Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerotek, Inc.
Represented By: Lucille Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey E. Vineyard
Represented By: Larry A. Weisberg
Represented By: Derrek William Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?