Acosta v. Local 1940, United Steel Workers International Union

Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: Local 1940, United Steel Workers International Union
Case Number: 1:2018cv02124
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:0401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (dmn)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Pretrial Order (Proposed Entry of Default) by R. Alexander Acosta. (Euliss, Richard)
December 12, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a proposed order for Doc. 5. (dmn)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Euliss, Richard)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. Local 1940, United Steel Workers International Union served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Euliss, Richard)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/05/18. (ki)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Local 1940, United Steel Workers International Union and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (dmn)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Local 1940, United Steel Workers International Union, filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Local 1940, United Steel Workers International Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Richard D Euliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 1940, United Steel Workers International Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?