Kauffman et al v. Aria Flooring
Plaintiff: Jack Figured and Lester W. Kauffman, III
Defendant: Aria Flooring
Case Number: 1:2018cv02144
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Jack Figured, Lester W. Kauffman, III against Aria Flooring.Signed by Paula Rowe, Deputy Clerk on 12/4/18. (pjr)
December 4, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Notice of Default sent to Aria Flooring. (pjr)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aria Flooring for failure to plead or otherwise defend.Signed by Paula Rowe, Deputy Clerk on 12/4/18. (pjr)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, Aria Flooring, by Jack Figured, Lester W. Kauffman, III. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnston, Charles)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Jack Figured, Lester W. Kauffman, III. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnston, Charles)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lester W. Kauffman, III, Jack Figured. Aria Flooring served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Johnston, Charles)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 11:00 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See attached court calendar for dates that MUST be utilized when a term is selected. (eo)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aria Flooring and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aria Flooring (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4592533), filed by Lester W. Kauffman, III, Jack Figured. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kauffman et al v. Aria Flooring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aria Flooring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Figured
Represented By: Charles W. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester W. Kauffman, III
Represented By: Charles W. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?