Diaz v. Dauphin County Work Release Center et al

Plaintiff: Eric Diaz
Defendant: Prime Care Medical Inc., Dauphin County Pennsylvania, Dauphin County Prison, Dauphin County Probation and Parole Department, Dauphin County Work Release Center and Case Management Unit
Case Number: 1:2018cv02159
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: RM
1 Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER sent to Prison Superintendent/WardenSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/3/19. (ma)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: In accord with the accompanying Memorandum #8 ; Pltf's mtn to proceed IFP #2 is Granted without full prepayment of costs. Pltf's complaint is Dismissed without leave to amend. Clerk shall close this case.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/3/19. (ma)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM re Complaint #1 and mtn for IPF #2 (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/3/19. (ma)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(aaa)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eric Diaz. (ep)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 TEN 10 DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 10 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Pltf's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action.Signed by LP on 11/09/2018. (lp) Modified on 11/9/2018 (lp). Sent Administrative Order to Superintendent and plaintiff.
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (rw)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION by Eric Diaz allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account. (rw)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Diaz.(rw)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Case Management Unit, Dauphin County Pennsylvania, Dauphin County Prison, Dauphin County Probation and Parole Department, Dauphin County Work Release Center and Prime Care Medical Inc. lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Eric Diaz.(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Dauphin County Work Release Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Care Medical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dauphin County Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dauphin County Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dauphin County Probation and Parole Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dauphin County Work Release Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Management Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?