United States of America v. Kline
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Joshua A. Kline
Case Number: 1:2018cv02174
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42:1471
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Joshua A. Kline served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Solarz, Rebecca)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/14/18. (ve)
November 13, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Kane. (dmn)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joshua A. Kline and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joshua A. Kline, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua A. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Solarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?