Smallwood v. Smaritan Caregivers LLC

Plaintiff: Tracey Smallwood
Defendant: Smaritan Caregivers LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02334
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order 8 SCHEDULING ORDER Setting Initial Case Management Conference for 2/28/2019 @ 10:15 AM - placement of the telephone conference call to chambers is the responsibility of counsel for plaintiff(s). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/29/19. (ki)
January 28, 2019 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Smaritan Caregivers LLC.(Crocenzi, Michael)
January 8, 2019 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Tracey Smallwood. Smaritan Caregivers LLC waiver sent on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. (Levko, Christa)
December 10, 2018 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jonathan W. Chase, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/10/18. (ki)
December 10, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner. Jonathan Chase, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
December 10, 2018 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jonathan W Chase on behalf of Tracey Smallwood Attorney Jonathan W. Chase is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4619280.. (Chase, Jonathan)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/7/18. (ki)
December 6, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Smaritan Caregivers LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Smaritan Caregivers LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4617752), filed by Tracey Smallwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smallwood v. Smaritan Caregivers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Smallwood
Represented By: Christa V Levko
Represented By: Jonathan W Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smaritan Caregivers LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Crocenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?