Mutschler v. Wetzel et al

Plaintiff: Tony Lee Mutschler
Defendant: Mark Capazza, John E. Wetzel and Trevor Wingard
Case Number: 1:2018cv02335
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
0 Judge: EBC
1 Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in Western District of Pennsylvania as case 2:18-cv-01676, filed 12/18/2018. (jw)
December 11, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case electronically transferred to WD of PA (eo)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE- to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); Jumara, 55 F.3d at 879. (eo)
December 10, 2018 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP and an authorization form within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Civil Rights), #2 Authorization Form)(lp)
December 7, 2018 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (lg)
December 7, 2018 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 order)(lg)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Tony Lee Mutschler.(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mutschler v. Wetzel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Lee Mutschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Capazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Wingard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?