Honesty v. Liberty Mutual Insurance

Plaintiff: Kenita Honesty
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Case Number: 1:2018cv02363
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Kerns notified the Clerk of her general admission on 2/4/19; no further admission paperwork required. (lg)
February 5, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Attorney Laura E Kerns (lg)
February 4, 2019 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura E Kerns on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance (Kerns, Laura)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER: A Case Management Conference has been set for 2/25/2019 @9:15 AM before Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo. This conference is by phone with the call to be initiated by the pltf unless otherwise arranged. A joint case mgmnt plan is to be filed by 2/18/19.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/8/19. (ma)
December 19, 2018 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Carlos, Pamela)
December 13, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Kenita Honesty and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
December 12, 2018 1 Notice of Removal against Kenita Honesty ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4622586) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A Part 1, #2 Exh. A Part 2)(pjr) Modified on 12/13/2018 (pjr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honesty v. Liberty Mutual Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenita Honesty
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Pamela A. Carlos
Represented By: Laura E. Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?