Stewart v. Stewart et al
Plaintiff: Terrence S. Stewart
Defendant: Gary A. Stewart, Robert H. Stewart, Jr., Karyl Stewart Gilbert and Karyl L. Gilbert
Case Number: 1:2018cv02372
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Referring Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #12 MOTION to Strike filed by Terrence S. Stewart.(Mogin, Paul)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (COMPLEX TRACK) - Sets forth case management instructions, guidelines & pretria/trial schedule, inc. - Fact Discovery due by 10/31/2019; Motions in Limine due by 3/4/20; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2020 @ 10:00 AM in Harrisburg Jury Room #2; Jury Selection & Trial set for 5/4/2020 @ 09:30 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner; Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2019; Pretrial Memos due by noon on 4/15/2020. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/24/19. (ki)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION to Strike filed by Karyl Stewart Gilbert, Gary A. Stewart, Robert H. Stewart, Jr.(DeAngelo, James)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Terrence S. Stewart. (Mogin, Paul)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Hetherington on behalf of All Defendants (Hetherington, Logan)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike by Karyl Stewart Gilbert, Gary A. Stewart, Robert H. Stewart, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeAngelo, James)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 1/23/2019 @ 11:15 AM - placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of counsel for plaintiff(s). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/3/19. (ki)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Hyser-Staub on behalf of All Defendants (Hyser-Staub, Sarah)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana W. Chilson on behalf of All Defendants (Chilson, Dana)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. DeAngelo on behalf of All Defendants (DeAngelo, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Stephen D. Raber, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/20/18. (ki)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Paul Mogin, Esquire.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/20/18. (ki)
December 20, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners, Paul Mogin, Stephen Raber and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kevin M. Skjoldal on behalf of Terrence S. Stewart Attorney Stephen Raber is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4629403.. (Skjoldal, Kevin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kevin M. Skjoldal on behalf of Terrence S. Stewart Attorney Paul Mogin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4629389.. (Skjoldal, Kevin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons, filed by Terrence S. Stewart. (Skjoldal, Kevin)
December 13, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Conner. (ve)
December 13, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Stephen Raber and Paul Mogin can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Karyl Stewart Gilbert, Gary A. Stewart, Robert H. Stewart, Jr and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karyl Stewart Gilbert, Gary A. Stewart, Robert H. Stewart, Jr ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4623981) filed by Terrence S. Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exh 1, #3 Exh 2, #4 Exh 3, #5 Exh 4, #6 Exh 5, #7 Exh 6, #8 Exh 7, #9 Exh 8, #10 Exh 9, #11 Exh 10, #12 Exh 11, #13 Exh 12)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary A. Stewart
Represented By: James P. DeAngelo
Represented By: Dana W. Chilson
Represented By: Logan Hetherington
Represented By: Sarah Hyser-Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Stewart, Jr.
Represented By: James P. DeAngelo
Represented By: Dana W. Chilson
Represented By: Logan Hetherington
Represented By: Sarah Hyser-Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karyl Stewart Gilbert
Represented By: James P. DeAngelo
Represented By: Dana W. Chilson
Represented By: Logan Hetherington
Represented By: Sarah Hyser-Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karyl L. Gilbert
Represented By: James P. DeAngelo
Represented By: Dana W. Chilson
Represented By: Logan Hetherington
Represented By: Sarah Hyser-Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence S. Stewart
Represented By: Paul Mogin
Represented By: Michael McAuliffe Miller
Represented By: Kevin M. Skjoldal
Represented By: Stephen D Raber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?