Cooke v. Penn State Health Milton S. Hershey Medical Center

Plaintiff: Tabitha Cooke
Defendant: Penn State Health Milton S. Hershey Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv02387
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Tabitha Cooke. Penn State Health Milton S. Hershey Medical Center waiver sent on 12/27/2018, answer due 2/25/2019. (Murphy, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Conrad on behalf of Penn State Health Milton S. Hershey Medical Center (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Conrad, Nancy)
January 3, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Statistical Update to Case. (admin, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/2/19. (ve)
December 18, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Kane (jw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Penn State Health Milton S. Hershey Medical Center and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Penn State Health Milton S. Hershey Medical Center ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4626867), filed by Tabitha Cooke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooke v. Penn State Health Milton S. Hershey Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Cooke
Represented By: Michael Murphy
Represented By: Michael P Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn State Health Milton S. Hershey Medical Center
Represented By: Nancy Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?