Jackson et al v. Hands-On-Nursing, Inc.

Plaintiff: Keysha Scott, Stacey Jackson and Sheena Warren
Defendant: Hands-On-Nursing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02442
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2019 10:00 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize the dates contained in the attached calendar in their JCMP. (eo)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Stacey Jackson, Keysha Scott, Sheena Warren. Hands-On-Nursing, Inc. waiver sent on 1/2/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Morcom, Peggy)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Hands-On-Nursing Inc. on 1/3/19, filed by Stacey Jackson, Keysha Scott, Sheena Warren. (Morcom, Peggy)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hands-On-Nursing, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hands-On-Nursing, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4633398) filed by Stacey Jackson, Keysha Scott, Sheena Warren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Hands-On-Nursing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hands-On-Nursing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keysha Scott
Represented By: Peggy M. Morcom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Jackson
Represented By: Peggy M. Morcom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheena Warren
Represented By: Peggy M. Morcom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?