Still v. Robert M. Neff, Inc.

Plaintiff: David E. Still
Defendant: Robert M. Neff, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00086
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Mario Bordogna can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Robert M. Neff, Inc..(Bordogna, Mario)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by David E. Still. Robert M. Neff, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Weisberg, Larry)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/15/2019. (ve)
January 14, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Kane. (dmn)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robert M. Neff, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert M. Neff, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4646684), filed by David E. Still. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Still v. Robert M. Neff, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Still
Represented By: Derrek William Cummings
Represented By: Stephen P. Gunther
Represented By: Larry A. Weisberg
Represented By: Steve Todd Mahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Neff, Inc.
Represented By: Mario R Bordogna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?