Norfolk Southern Railway Company v. Interstate Commodities, Inc.

Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Defendant: Interstate Commodities, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00241
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Interstate Commodities, Inc. re #11 Answer to Complaint (Hynum, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Interstate Commodities, Inc..(Hynum, Michael)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: A Case Management Conference has been set for 5/20/2019 @ 10:15 AM before Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo. This conference is by phone with the call to be initiated by the pltf unless otherwise arranged. A joint case mgmnt plan is to be filed by 5/13/19.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 4/1/19. (ma)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order approving stipulation for exttm #8 ; Interstate Commodities, Inc. shall respond/answer pltf's complaint by 4/11/2019.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 3/27/19. (ma)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Second Joint for Extension of time to file Responsive Pleading by Interstate Commodities, Inc.. (Hynum, Michael)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving the stipulation for exttm. Answer/response to complaint due 3/28/2019.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 3/12/19. (ma)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Joint, First) by Interstate Commodities, Inc.. (Hynum, Michael)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Hynum on behalf of Interstate Commodities, Inc. (Hynum, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER/NOTICE Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 3/1/19. (ma)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L Frey on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Frey, Timothy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Interstate Commodities, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Interstate Commodities, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4672210), filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfolk Southern Railway Company v. Interstate Commodities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Commodities, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Hynum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Cohen
Represented By: Timothy L Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?