Jones v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Geradette M. Jones
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00245
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: Yvette Kane
1 Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/7/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (ep)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Service Form) (ep)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/13/19. (ms)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/12/19. (dmn)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Geradette M. Jones.(dmn)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Geradette M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geradette M. Jones
Represented By: Patrick J. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?