Wild v. Advanced Termite Control, Inc.

Plaintiff: Alexander Wild
Defendant: Advanced Termite Control, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00267
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Dft Advanced Termite Control shall show casue within 10 days of this order why jgmnt should lnot be entered against it in accord witht he court's 2/27/19 order #29 . Dft's failure to respons will result in the entry of default jgmnt. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 4/1/19. (ma)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Dft has (20) days from the date of this order for counsel to enter an appearance. Dfts failure to obtain counsel may result in a default judgment. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 2/27/19. (ma)
February 19, 2019 Filing 28 AO121 Sent to Copyright Office with Copy of Transfer Order. (aaa)
February 17, 2019 Filing 27 Case transferred electronically in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:17-cv-00443. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. jw
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING #19 Motion for Default Judgment and TRANSFERRING case to the Middle District Pennsylvania, Harrisburg Division. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 25 Signed Certified Mail Receipt of #23 Order (dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 24 Certified Mail Receipt of #23 Order. (dm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Regarding Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - the Clerks Office is ordered to mail a copy of this Order via certified mail to Advanced Termite Control, Inc., C/O Caryn Guderjohn, 4131 Huffmanville Road, Glen Rock, Pennsylvania 17327. Defendant may respond to this Order and the attached order for supplemental briefing on or before November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to #20 Order, #19 MOTION for Default Judgment against Advanced Termite Control, Inc. by Alexander Wild. (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Default Judgment against Advanced Termite Control, Inc. by Alexander Wild. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Plaintiff to move for a default judgment pursuant to FederalRule of Civil Procedure 55(b). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 16 Copy of #15 Order sent to Advanced Termite Control, Inc. via regular mail and CMRRR. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Advanced Termite Control, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 4/2/2018. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
December 14, 2017 Filing 14 Certified Mail Receipt of #12 Order on Motion to Strike and Plaintiff's #11 Motion to Strike Defendant's #10 Answer to Complaint from Caryn Guderjohn. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 13 Copy of #11 Motion & #12 Order sent to Garyn Guderjohn via CMRRR. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #11 Motion to Strike Defendant's #10 Answer to Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
October 20, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #10 Answer to Complaint by Alexander Wild. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
September 28, 2017 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Advanced Termite Control, Inc..(ml) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Advanced Termite Control, Inc. (ml) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default against Advanced Termite Control, Inc. by Alexander Wild. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mathew Higbee In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Wild. Advanced Termite Control, Inc. served on 7/31/2017, answer due 8/21/2017. (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 Order to Show Cause by Alexander Wild. (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Alexander Wild. Show Cause Response due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (ml) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
May 12, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Advanced Termite Control, Inc.. (gr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
May 11, 2017 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alexander Wild. (gr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Alexander Wild. (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Alexander Wild. (Higbee, Mathew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/12/2017) (gr). [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9579920), filed by Alexander Wild. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from Texas Western on 2/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wild v. Advanced Termite Control, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Termite Control, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Wild
Represented By: Mathew Kidman Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?