Washington v. Hayden et al

Plaintiff: Clifton Jerome Washington
Defendant: Correctional Officer Hayden, Correctional Officer Schwartz and USP Canaan Shu Staff
Case Number: 1:2019cv00273
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) and AO85 Notice and Consent form Mailed to Hayden, Schwartz, USP Canaan Shu Staff c/o Atty. Michael FiggsGanter with copy of #10 Waiver Order and #1 Complaint; Waiver of Service due by 4/25/2019. Copy of all above also sent to U.S. Atty and U.S. Atty General Wash DC; (ep)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants and copy of this Order to Warden/Superintendent. ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED;Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/26/19. (ep)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ga)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Clifton Jerome Washington. (pjr)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Clifton Jerome Washington.(pjr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 02/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Civil Rights))(lp)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(aaa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (aaa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (aaa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clifton Jerome Washington.(aaa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Clifton Jerome Washington. (Attachments: #1 part two, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Hayden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP Canaan Shu Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Jerome Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?