UPMC Pinnacle et al v. Shapiro
Plaintiff: UPMC Somerset, UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals and UPMC Health Network, Inc.
Defendant: Joshua D. Shapiro
Petitioner: Hospital and Healthsystem Association of Pennsylvania and Robert B. Sklaroff, M.D.
Amicus Curiae: Highmark Health
Case Number: 1:2019cv00298
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 61 Letter from Plaintiffs re: Commonwealth Court's decision dtd 3 April 2019. (DeJulius, Leon)
April 3, 2019 Filing 60 BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Amicus Curiae Highmark Health re #36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Highmark Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1)(Booker, Daniel)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to File (eo)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Leave to File (eo)
April 2, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss by UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order)(DeJulius, Leon)
March 29, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Joshua D. Shapiro. Related document: #36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joshua D. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1)(Goldman, Jonathan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION to Compel Discovery by UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K)(Torborg, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 54 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Stephen A. Cozen (eo)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - Because Defendants Motion to Dismiss addresses whether this Court hassubject matter jurisdiction over the instant action, resolving that motion may render nugatory HAPs Motion to Intervene because HAP cannot intervene in an action over which this Court otherwise lacks subject matter jurisdiction. Accordingly, we shall SUSPEND briefing as to HAPs motion and withhold judgment until after disposition of Defendants Motion to Dismiss. (eo)
March 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
March 26, 2019 Filing 52 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Stephen A. Cozen on behalf of UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset Attorney Stephen Cozen is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4713286.. (Cozen, Stephen)
March 25, 2019 Filing 51 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6)(DeJulius, Leon)
March 25, 2019 Filing 50 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Hospital and Healthsystem Association of Pennsylvania. (Zabaneh, Sean)
March 25, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Intervene by Hospital and Healthsystem Association of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A to Motion (Proposed Intervenor Complaint), #2 Exhibit(s) Index of Exhibits to Proposed Intervenor Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) 1 to Proposed Intervenor Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) 2 to Proposed Intervenor Complaint, #5 Exhibit(s) 3 to Proposed Intervenor Complaint, #6 Exhibit(s) 4 to Proposed Intervenor Complaint, #7 Exhibit(s) 5 to Proposed Intervenor Complaint, #8 Exhibit(s) 6 to Proposed Intervenor Complaint, #9 Exhibit(s) 7 to Proposed Intervenor Complaint, #10 Memo Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, #11 Unpublished Opinion(s) Cited in Brief in Support of Motion, #12 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #13 Proposed Order)(Zabaneh, Sean)
March 25, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. Cozen on behalf of UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset (Cozen, Stephen)
March 22, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Betsko on behalf of Joshua D. Shapiro (Betsko, Joseph)
March 20, 2019 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Highmark Health. (Booker, Daniel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Highmark Health. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Booker, Daniel)
March 19, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation in their Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Unopposed) by UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeJulius, Leon)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (eo)
March 15, 2019 Filing 42 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joshua D. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s) Unpublished Cases, #2 Unpublished Opinion(s) USA, et al v. Comcast Corp, et al (11-0106) Supplemental Statement)(Neary, Keli)
March 15, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation for Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Joshua D. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neary, Keli)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - As a point of clarification, pursuant to this Courts Order of February 26, 2019, (Doc. 20), Defendant in the above-captioned case SHALL FILE a brief in support of his Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. 36), by or before Friday, March 15, 2019. Plaintiffs SHALL FILE a responsive brief in opposition within ten (10) days of the filing of the Defendants brief. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 3/13/19. (dmn)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - The Court is in receipt of the Motion for Permission to Intervene filed by Dr. Robert Sklaroff, MD. (Doc. 35). Also currently pending before the Court is a Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Joshua D. Shapiro. (Doc. 36). A brief in support of that motion is due by or before March 14, 2019. Plaintiffs responsive brief in opposition is due within ten days of Defendants supporting brief. Because disposing of Defendants Motion to Dismiss may moot Dr. Sklaroffs Motion for Permission to Intervene, we shall SUSPEND briefing as to Dr. Sklaroffs motion and withhold judgment until after disposition of Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 3/8/19. (dmn)
March 5, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Thomas Korn on behalf of Joshua D. Shapiro (Korn, Alexander)
March 4, 2019 Filing 37 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #35 MOTION to Intervene filed by Robert B. Sklaroff, MD.(aaa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss by Joshua D. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neary, Keli)
March 1, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Permission to Intervene by Robert B. Sklaroff, MD.(aaa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc.. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 33 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Health Options, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Health Options, Inc.. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Health Network, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Health Network, Inc.. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Health Coverage identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Health Coverage. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Health Plan, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Health Plan, Inc.. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Somerset identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Somerset. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Pinnacle Memorial identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Pinnacle Memorial. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Pinnacle Hanover identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Pinnacle Hanover. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by UPMC Pinnacle identifying Corporate Parent UPMC for UPMC Pinnacle. (DeJulius, Leon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 22 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORMS APPROVED as to Leon DeJulius and David S. Torborg (eo)
February 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy W. Wertz on behalf of Joshua D. Shapiro (Wertz, Tracy)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - briefing schedule (eo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 18 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Anderson T. Bailey (eo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb Curtis Enerson on behalf of Joshua D. Shapiro (Enerson, Caleb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Donahue, III on behalf of Joshua D. Shapiro. (Donahue, James)
February 26, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Anderson T Bailey on behalf of UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset Attorney Anderson Bailey is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4683838.. (Bailey, Anderson)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Aaron Miller on behalf of UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset (Miller, Stephen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by David S Torborg on behalf of UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset Attorney David Torborg is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4682993.. (Torborg, David)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 supplement to ECF No. 10 by UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset. #10 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, Lee DeJulius. (DeJulius, Leon)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared D. Bayer on behalf of UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset (Bayer, Jared)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Leon F DeJulius on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Anderson T. Bailey is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4682280., filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(DeJulius, Leon)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Scott Goldman on behalf of Joshua D. Shapiro. (Goldman, Jonathan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Keli M. Neary on behalf of Joshua D. Shapiro. (Neary, Keli)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset.(eo)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/26/2019 10:00 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. (eo)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (eo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 B, #5 C, #6 D, #7 E, #8 F, #9 G, #10 Declaration, #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Declaration, #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Declaration, #15 Declaration) #16 Declartion of W. Thomas McGough, Jr. (Exhibits A-G of McGough Decl. attached at ECF Nos. 3-3 through 3-9)(aaa)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Somerset. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joshua D. Shapiro ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4680605), filed by UPMC Pinnacle Memorial, UPMC Health Options, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals, UPMC Pinnacle Hanover, UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz, UPMC Health Coverage, UPMC Health Plan, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle, UPMC Somerset, UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc., UPMC Health Network, Inc., UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 B, #5 C, #6 D, #7 E)(aaa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/22/2019) (dmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UPMC Pinnacle et al v. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Somerset
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Pinnacle Carlisle
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Health Options, Inc.
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Pinnacle Hanover
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Pinnacle
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Pinnacle Memorial
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Benefit Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Health Coverage
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Pinnacle Pinnacle Lititz
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Pinnacle Hospitals
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC Health Network, Inc.
Represented By: Leon F DeJulius
Represented By: Stephen A. Cozen
Represented By: David S Torborg
Represented By: Anderson T Bailey
Represented By: Jared D. Bayer
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua D. Shapiro
Represented By: Joseph S. Betsko
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Goldman
Represented By: Tracy W. Wertz
Represented By: James A. Donahue, III
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Represented By: Alexander Thomas Korn
Represented By: Keli M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Highmark Health
Represented By: Daniel I Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hospital and Healthsystem Association of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Sean S. Zabaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert B. Sklaroff, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?