Sikora v. CWork Solutions, LP.
Plaintiff: Margaret Sikora
Defendant: CWork Solutions, LP.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00367
Filed: March 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Janice Sued Agresti on behalf of CWork Solutions, LP. (Agresti, Janice)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Hank on behalf of CWork Solutions, LP. (Hank, Matthew)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/8/2019. (ve)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Margaret Sikora. CWork Solutions, LP. waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 and 399 Waiver Forms)(Donham, Jeremy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CWork Solutions, LP. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
March 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CWork Solutions, LP. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4689661), filed by Margaret Sikora. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sikora v. CWork Solutions, LP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Sikora
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Donham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWork Solutions, LP.
Represented By: Matthew J Hank
Represented By: Janice Sued Agresti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?