Acosta v. AA to ZZ Child Care and Learning Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: AA to ZZ Child Care and Learning Center, Inc., Ryan Zimmerman and Ashleigh Zimmerman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00372
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by R. Alexander Acosta. Ryan Zimmerman waiver sent on 3/28/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Castillo, M. del Pilar)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by R. Alexander Acosta. Ashleigh Zimmerman waiver sent on 3/28/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Castillo, M. del Pilar)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by R. Alexander Acosta. AA to ZZ Child Care and Learning Center, Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Castillo, M. del Pilar)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Letter to Counsel from Court Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/5/19. (ki)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. AA to ZZ Child Care and Learning Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AA to ZZ Child Care and Learning Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashleigh Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: M. del Pilar Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?