Dunham et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: James Dunham and Christine Dunham
3Rd Party Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Gregory Hart
Case Number: 1:2019cv00396
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Referring Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gregory Hart. (Jordan, Maureen)
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen A. Jordan on behalf of Gregory Hart (Jordan, Maureen)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 8/6/2019. Defendant Expert Report is due by 9/5/2019. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 12/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 4/17/2019. (ktt)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 4/5/2019. (ktt)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 THIRD Party Summons Issued as to Gregory Hart. (aaa)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Approved & case REASSIGNED to Chief Magistrate Judge Schwab; 4/30/19 CMC is CANCELLED. (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 4/4/19. (ki)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Christine Dunham. (Lutz, David)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Rauch, Kevin)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Gregory Hart, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Gregory Hart, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Rauch, Kevin)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Rauch, Kevin)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER RESCHEDULING Initial Case Management Conference from 4/18/19 TO 4/30/2019 @ 11:00 AM. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/26/19. (ki) Modified on 3/26/2019 (ki).
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 COUNTY COURT RECORD from Dauphin County Court of Common Pleas. (rw)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER Rescheduling Initial Case Management Conference from 4/16/19 TO 4/18/2019 @ 10:00 AM. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/11/19. (ki)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER Setting Initial Case Management Conference for 4/16/2019 @ 10:30 AM - counsel for plaintiff(s) shall initiate the telephone conference call to chambers. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/8/19. (ki)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christine Dunham, James Dunham and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Dauphin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cv-0605. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4693049), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunham et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin D. Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dunham
Represented By: David L. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Dunham
Represented By: David L. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gregory Hart
Represented By: Maureen A. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?