Jones v. State Correctional Institute Coal Township et al

Plaintiff: Tremar Jones
Defendant: Sidiq Mansray, C.O. Earb, Unit Manager McGinley, State Corrections Institute Coal Township and Jennifer Shaud
Case Number: 1:2019cv00399
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PT
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ep)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tremar Jones. (ep)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tremar Jones.(ep)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tremar Jones.(ep)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Tremar Jones inquiring if he needs summonses and to refile motion for ifp (which he already filed before case was transferred to Middle District); (ep)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 03/07/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (rw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER issued on 3/6/19. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(rw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tremar Jones.(rw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred electronically from Eastern District of Pennsylvania; Case Number 2:19-cv-00604 containing original documents.
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PA. THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 2/26/2019. 2/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/6/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by TREMAR JONES. (pr, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/6/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Application for prisoners to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs filed by TREMAR JONES.Certification.(pr, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/6/2019.]
February 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TREMAR JONES. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/6/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/6/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EARB, SIDIQ MANSRAY, MCGINLEY, JENNIFER SHAUD, STATE CORRECTIONS INSTITUTE COAL TOWNSHIP lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by TREMAR JONES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/6/2019.] Modified on 3/6/2019 (rw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. State Correctional Institute Coal Township et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidiq Mansray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Earb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Manager McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Corrections Institute Coal Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Shaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tremar Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?