Progressive Specialty Insurance Company v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Two Brothers Pizzeria Italian Market, Leonardo Lopez, Giuro, Inc., Rita Ramirez, Joseph Romano, Marco Estrada and MMG Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00801
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. Leonardo Lopez served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Burch, Randy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (Burch, Randy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Giuro, Inc.. (Brenner, Thomas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Marco Estrada, Rita Ramirez.(Brenner, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by Giuro, Inc., Two Brothers Pizzeria Italian Market.(Brenner, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Brenner on behalf of Marco Estrada, Rita Ramirez. (Brenner, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 10:45 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize dates on the attached court calendar when a trial term is selected in their JCMP(eo)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by MMG Insurance Company. (McNamara, Kevin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MMG Insurance Company.(McNamara, Kevin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. McNamara on behalf of MMG Insurance Company (McNamara, Kevin)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. Marco Estrada served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Burch, Randy)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. Rita Ramirez served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Burch, Randy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Brenner on behalf of Giuro, Inc., Two Brothers Pizzeria Italian Market (Brenner, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. MMG Insurance Company served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Burch, Randy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. Giuro, Inc. served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019; Two Brothers Pizzeria Italian Market served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Burch, Randy)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4756537), filed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Brothers Pizzeria Italian Market
Represented By: Thomas Edward Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonardo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giuro, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Edward Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas Edward Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Estrada
Represented By: Thomas Edward Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMG Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin C. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Randy T Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?