Bucci et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing
Plaintiff: Rocco Bucci and Carol Bucci
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing
Case Number: 1:2019cv00869
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 2:19-cv-02482, filed 06/06/2019. (jw)
June 6, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (ve)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE- IT IS ORDERED THAT the Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER the above-captioned action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a).1 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the above-captioned action. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/6/2019. (ve)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED THAT the parties are directed to SHOW CAUSE, within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, why the above-captioned action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/24/2019. (ve)
May 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Kane. (dmn)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bayview Loan Servicing and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bayview Loan Servicing ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4763925), filed by Carol Bucci, Rocco Bucci. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bucci et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocco Bucci
Represented By: Joshua L Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Bucci
Represented By: Joshua L Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?