Tucker et al v. Santander Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Jody L. Tucker, Glenn D. Meyer and Jody L. Bent
Defendant: Santander Bank, N.A. and York Federal Savings and Loan Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv00908
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING all deadlines in case, directing Clrk of Ct to mark matter CLOSED for statistical purposes only & directing parties to, as soon as practicable, submit appropriate dismissal filing in acc w/ FRCP 41(a). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/3/19. (ki)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Mark W. Fidanza re: Confidential Settlement in Principle and Joint Request to Stay all Pending Case Deadlines. (Fidanza, Mark)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting deft's motion #5 to reschedule case mgmt conference - initial case mgmt conference rescheduled from 6/26/19 TO 7/10/19 @ 2:15 p.m. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/11/19. (ki)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Reschedule Case Management Conference by Santander Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(Fidanza, Mark)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Santander Bank, N.A..(Fidanza, Mark)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Santander Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Santander Holdings USA, Inc. for Santander Bank, N.A.. (Fidanza, Mark)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING ORDER Setting Initial Case Management Conference for 6/26/2019 @ 02:00 PM - Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the telephone conference to Chambers. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/3/19. (ki)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Santander Bank, N.A., York Federal Savings and Loan Association ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4770606). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 B, #4 C)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker et al v. Santander Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody L. Tucker
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Gettle
Represented By: Gregory H. Gettle
Represented By: Jeffrey A Gettle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn D. Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Gettle
Represented By: Gregory H. Gettle
Represented By: Jeffrey A Gettle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody L. Bent
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Gettle
Represented By: Gregory H. Gettle
Represented By: Jeffrey A Gettle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark W Fidanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York Federal Savings and Loan Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?