Hall v. Aerotek, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leon Hall
Defendant: Aerotek, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01094
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Leon Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2019 11:30 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize the dates on the attached calendar in their JCMP when a term is selected. (eo)
June 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Jones. (pjr)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER/NOTICE Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 6/26/19. (ma)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aerotek, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aerotek, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4798883), filed by Leon Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Aerotek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Hall
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Represented By: Richard S. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerotek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?