Ober et al v. Ocwen Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dale Ober and Lynne Ober
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Services, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC., PHH Mortgage Services, Ocwen Financial Corporation and Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01171
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/26/2019. (ve)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 COUNTY COURT RECORD from Lebanon County Court of Common Pleas. (aaa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Services, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC., Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., PHH Mortgage Services. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Messinger, Brett)
July 16, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case assigned to Judge Kane. (aaa)
July 16, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support of Doc. 2 as a separate entry using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)-Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). Counsel is also advised to file a certificate of service for Doc. 2. (pjr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Services, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC., Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., PHH Mortgage Services. (Attachments: #1 Memo Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Messinger, Brett)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Services, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., PHH Mortgage Services, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC., Ocwen Financial Corporation from Court of Common Pleas for Lebanon County, case number 2019-01059. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4809935), filed by Ocwen Loan Services, Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, PHH Mortgage Services, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC., Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Complaint)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ober et al v. Ocwen Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Ober
Represented By: David J. Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Ober
Represented By: David J. Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Services
Represented By: Brett L. Messinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.
Represented By: Brett L. Messinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Services
Represented By: Brett L. Messinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Brett L. Messinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Brett L. Messinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?