Brown v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adam A. Brown
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01190
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Haar, Matthew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Enlargement of Time (UNCONTESTED), filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haar, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Haar on behalf of Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. (Haar, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Adam A. Brown. (Porter, John)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2019 09:45 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize the dates contained on the attached calendar when completing their JCMP.(eo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Adam A. Brown. (dmn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4811816), filed by Adam A. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam A. Brown
Represented By: Michael B. Scheib
Represented By: John C. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Mid-Atlantic States, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M. Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?