Mumma v. Double M Development et al

Trustee: Trustee Markian R. Slobodian and United States Trustee
Appellee: S&T Bank, Double M Development and Byler Holdings, LLC
Appellant: Robert M. Mumma, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01194
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Designation of Record and Statement of Issues to be Presented filed by Robert M. Mumma, II. (dmn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal for Failure to Follow Rules filed by Markian R. Slobodian.(Slobodian, Markian)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal for Failure to Follow Rules by Markian R. Slobodian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Slobodian, Markian)
August 15, 2019 Notice of Appeal in the above-referenced matter was filed on 7/11/2019 and transmitted to District Court on 8/15/2019. To date, the times set forth in Fed. R. Bank. P. 8009 and 8010 have passed and no further filings have been received in connection with the appeal. Accordingly, the record is being transmitted based on the submissions filed as of today's date. (BK Court W-B 1, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT Notice of Supplemental Authority - Order entered 8/5/2019 by the Honorable John E. Jones, III in Case No. 1:19-cv-1024 by Double M Development re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal as a Nullity, #3 Brief in Support,. (Rohrbaugh, E.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY BRIEF re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal as a Nullity - Reply to the Response and Memorandum of Robert M. Mumma II filed by Double M Development.(Young, Lawrence)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal as a Nullity, #4 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal #2 filed by Robert M. Mumma, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-Application to Withdraw, #2 Proposed Order denying relief sought by Double M Development Motion to Dismiss Appeal, #3 Declaration of Service of Response and Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Winterhalter, Paul)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Double M Development re #5 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Copy of Order)(Rohrbaugh, E.)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: motion #2 to dismiss appeal, directing cnsl for Double M to forthwith provide a copy of this order to cnsl for Mumma & directing cnsl for Mummaw to file w/ Clrk of Ct a response to Double M's motion #2 by 7/26/19. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 7/23/19. (ki)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal #2 by Double M Development. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rohrbaugh, E.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal as a Nullity , filed by Double M Development. Related document: #2 MOTION to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal as a Nullity filed by Double M Development.(Rohrbaugh, E.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Appellant's Appeal as a Nullity by Double M Development. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rohrbaugh, E.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 1:17-bk-01334. Bankruptcy Judge Presiding Over Bankruptcy Case Robert N. Opel. File received (Attachments: #1 Order #39)(BK Court W-B 1, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mumma v. Double M Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Trustee Markian R. Slobodian
Represented By: Markian R. Slobodian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Gregory Benjamin Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: S&T Bank
Represented By: Brian Kile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Double M Development
Represented By: Lawrence V Young
Represented By: E. Haley Rohrbaugh
Represented By: Lawrence V. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Byler Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Deborah A. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert M. Mumma, II
Represented By: Paul J Winterhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?