Reed v. Best Friends Day Care Center
Plaintiff: Patricia Reed
Defendant: Best Friends Day Care Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv01311
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Referring Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/26/2019. (ktt)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order- In view of the consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge elected by theparties in the Joint Case Management Plan it is HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. The clerk is directed to reassign this matter to Chief Magistrate JudgeSchwab.2. The case management conference with the undersigned on September30, 2019, is cancelled. (eo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Best Friends Day Care Center. (Cunningham, Jordan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Best Friends Day Care Center.(Cunningham, Jordan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan D. Cunningham on behalf of Best Friends Day Care Center. (Cunningham, Jordan)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2019 11:00 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. Counsel must utilize the dates contained on the attached calendar when completing their JCMP.(eo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Best Friends Day Care Center and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Best Friends Day Care Center ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4828250), filed by Patricia Reed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Best Friends Day Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Friends Day Care Center
Represented By: Jordan D. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Reed
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Schott
Represented By: Jason M. Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?