United States for the Use and Benefit of Enginuity LLC and Enginuity, LLC v. Pontiac Drywall Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States for the Use and Benefit of Enginuity LLC and Enginuity, LLC
Counter Plaintiff: Pontiac Drywall Systems, Inc. and The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01393
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2019 10:00 AM before Honorable John E. Jones III. See attached calendars for trial term dates that must be utilized when completing the JCMP. (eo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by United States for the Use and Benefit of Enginuity LLC and Enginuity, LLC.(Kelley, Gregory)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Rudd, Jonathan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Pontiac Drywall Systems, Inc.. (Rudd, Jonathan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against United States for the Use and Benefit of Enginuity LLC and Enginuity, LLC by Pontiac Drywall Systems, Inc., The Guarantee Company of North America USA.(Rudd, Jonathan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Sara Schrauben, CFO for The Guarantee Co. of North America USA on 8/15/2019, filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of Enginuity LLC and Enginuity, LLC. (Winfield, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Lavonte Travis for Pontiac Drywall Systems, Inc. d/b/a PDSI Contractors on 8/14/2019, filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of Enginuity LLC and Enginuity, LLC. (Winfield, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by United States for the Use and Benefit of Enginuity LLC and Enginuity, LLC. (Winfield, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4840265), filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of Enginuity LLC and Enginuity, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States for the Use and Benefit of Enginuity LLC and Enginuity, LLC v. Pontiac Drywall Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Pontiac Drywall Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan H. Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Represented By: Jonathan H. Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States for the Use and Benefit of Enginuity LLC and Enginuity, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Winfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?