Harpster v. Bace LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bobbi Harpster
Defendant: Compators, INC and Bace LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01442
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND, CROSSCLAIM against Bace LLC by Compators, INC.(Della Vecchia, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/16/2019 (ve)
October 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Compators, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Della Vecchia, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: A Case Management conference will be conducted by the court on November 8, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. The telephone number of the court is 717-221-3990. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/10/2019. (ve)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance , filed by Compators, INC.(Della Vecchia, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bobbi Harpster of the Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Timoney, Patrick)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bobbi Harpster of Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Timoney, Patrick)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 BACE, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Plaintiff with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against Compators, INC by Bace LLC.(Farrell, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. Bates on behalf of Bace LLC (Bates, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Underwood on behalf of Bace LLC (Underwood, Elizabeth)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Farrell on behalf of Bace LLC (Farrell, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from the Court to Counsel re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/22/2019. (ve)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (mfa)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4848304), filed by Bobbi Harpster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harpster v. Bace LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi Harpster
Represented By: Patrick C. Timoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compators, INC
Represented By: Michael T Della Vecchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bace LLC
Represented By: John C. Farrell
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Bates
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?