Wenrich v. Palmyra Rehabilitation & Nursing, LLC
Plaintiff: Christina Wenrich
Defendant: Palmyra Rehabilitation & Nursing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01530
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: This case has been selected at random for MANDATORY REFERRAL to court-annexed mediation in accordance with Standing Order 04-3. case management conference shall be held on November 25, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. The telephone number of the court is 717-221-3990. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/10/2019. (ve)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Palmyra Rehabilitation & Nursing, LLC.(Davis, Glenn)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/25/2019. (ve)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Palmyra Rehabilitation et al on 09/16/2019, filed by Christina Wenrich. (Dion, Samuel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Palmyra Rehabilitation & Nursing, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (mfa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Palmyra Rehabilitation & Nursing, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4862717), filed by Christina Wenrich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wenrich v. Palmyra Rehabilitation & Nursing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmyra Rehabilitation & Nursing, LLC
Represented By: Glenn R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Wenrich
Represented By: Samuel A. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?