Yamuna Management LLC v. Shenandoah Telecommunications Company
Plaintiff: Yamuna Management LLC
Defendant: Shenandoah Telecommunications Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01722
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner - Case Reassigned to Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. Honorable Yvette Kane no longer assigned to the case. (ao)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shenandoah Telecommunications Company re #9 Answer to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses (Riches, Joseph)
November 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file a certificate of service for Doc. 9. (pjr)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Shenandoah Telecommunications Company.(Riches, Joseph)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yamuna Management LLC. Shenandoah Telecommunications Company served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (LaSalle, Paul)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yamuna Management LLC.(LaSalle, Paul)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Shenandoah Telecommunications Company by Shenandoah Telecommunications Company.(Riches, Joseph)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Shenandoah Telecommunications Company.(Riches, Joseph)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/9/2019. (ve)
October 3, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Kane. (mfa)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shenandoah Telecommunications Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Yamuna Management LLC. (rw)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shenandoah Telecommunications Company ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4889583), filed by Yamuna Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yamuna Management LLC v. Shenandoah Telecommunications Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yamuna Management LLC
Represented By: Paul L LaSalle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenandoah Telecommunications Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?