Skaggs v. Gabriel Brothers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Deborah Skaggs
Defendant: Gabriel Brothers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02032
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Deborah Skaggs of Filing Consent to Join Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Consent to Join Form - William Arnold, IV)(Conway, Jason)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Deborah Skaggs. Gabriel Brothers, Inc. waiver sent on 11/26/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Conway, Jason)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by the Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/4/2019. (ve)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gabriel Brothers, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gabriel Brothers, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4939779), filed by Deborah Skaggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skaggs v. Gabriel Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Skaggs
Represented By: Jason James Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?