Davis v. Hartye et al
Plaintiff: Damion G.V. Davis
Defendant: Judge Alice Hartye, Mary Ellen Withrow, Kevin McAleenan and Simona Flores
Case Number: 1:2020cv00259
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Referring Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner - Case Reassigned to Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jkc)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Damion G.V. Davis, Simona Flores, Alice Hartye, Kevin McAleenan, Mary Ellen Withrow YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 5/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Respondents' Direct Consent Form) (cw)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Simona Flores, Alice Hartye, Kevin McAleenan, Mary Ellen Withrow to #7 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
March 10, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: As per Magistrate Judge Mehalchick's Order (Doc. 7), this action is now a 2241 habeas corpus action. (lp)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - AND NOW, this 10th day of March, 2020, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. Daviss complaint (Doc. 1) is converted to a petition for a writ of habeas corpus brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. 2. Daviss motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2) is GRANTED, and the petition is deemed filed. 3. The Court exercises its discretion under Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts, 28 U.S.C. foll. 2254, to apply those rules to this 2241 petition. 4. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of the Petition (Doc. 1) and this Order on, Clair Doll, Warden of York County Prison,2 and on the United States Attorney, and to note the address of the United States Attorney on the front of the docket sheet in this case. All documents filed by the parties and by the Court shall be served upon the United States Attorney. See Rule 4, 28 U.S.C. foll. 2254. 5. On or before March 31, 2020, the Respondent shall file an answer, motion, or other response to the allegations of the petition. See Rule 4, 28 U.S.C. foll. 2254; Rule 5, 28 U.S.C. foll. 2254. 6. The Petitioner shall, if he so desires, file a reply to the Respondents answer or other pleading within fourteen (14) days after its service. See Rule 5(e), 28 U.S.C. foll. 2254. 7. A determination as to whether or not the petitioner shall be produced for a hearing will be held in abeyance pending the filing of the Respondents answer or other pleading. Show Cause Response due by 3/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 3/10/2020. (cw)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ep)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(mfa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED (mfa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (mfa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Damion G.V. Davis.(mfa) Modified on 2/18/2020 (lp). See attached "certification" by York County Prison.
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION against All respondents lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Damion G.V. Davis.(mfa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/19/2020) (lp). Modified on 3/31/2020 (lp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Hartye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Alice Hartye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ellen Withrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simona Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damion G.V. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?