Golden Vision Flower, Inc v. Aries Global Logistics, Inc
Plaintiff: Golden Vision Flower, Inc
Defendant: Aries Global Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00486
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 49:14706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case has been closed per the stipulation of dismissal at Doc. No. 24 and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (dmn)
May 18, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Aries Global Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Gary)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - AND NOW, on this 1st day of May 2020, IT IS ORDERED THAT Defendant is directed to respond to Plaintiffs complaint (Doc. No. 1) within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/1/20. (dmn)
April 6, 2020 Filing 22 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/6/20. (dmn)
March 26, 2020 Filing 21 Case transferred electronically in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:20-cv-00108 containing electronic documents.
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania for all further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case and close the file. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/24/2020. (MEH) ctp [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
March 15, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case filed by Golden Vision Flower, Inc. (Waugh, Christian) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiff shall file its response to the Motion to Transfer Venue (Doc. 12) on or before March 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 3/12/2020. (MDH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Golden Vision Flower, Inc. (Waugh, Christian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER In the interests of justice, the undersigned transfers this case to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman, with her permission, to be considered along with 673753 Ontario Limited v. HDZ Logistics, LLC, No. 6:19-cv-00506-40LRH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 3/4/2020. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related Case Order by Aries Global Logistics, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (O'Quinn, Robert) Modified on 3/3/2020 (RDO). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Aries Global Logistics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Aries Global Logistics, Inc., Corporate Parent Aries Global Logistics, Inc., Corporate Parent Aries Global Logistics, Inc. for Aries Global Logistics, Inc... (O'Quinn, Robert) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Aries Global Logistics, Inc.. (O'Quinn, Robert) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing Declaration of Joseph Greco by Aries Global Logistics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(O'Quinn, Robert) Modified on 2/24/2020 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of compliance by Golden Vision Flower, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Related Case Order and Track Two Notice)(Waugh, Christian) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 1/31/2020 by Golden Vision Flower, Inc as to Aries Global Logistics, Inc. . (Waugh, Christian) Modified on 2/4/2020 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Golden Vision Flower, Inc. (Waugh, Christian) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #4 Related case order by Golden Vision Flower, Inc. Related case(s): no (Waugh, Christian) Modified on 1/30/2020 (SPM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/27/2020. (MEH) ctp [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/27/2020. (MEH) ctp [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/27/2020. (MEH) ctp [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Aries Global Logistics, Inc. (SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-108-Orl-41GJK. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16382939) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Waugh, Christian) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Vision Flower, Inc v. Aries Global Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Vision Flower, Inc
Represented By: Christian W. Waugh
Represented By: Morgan Lynn Fayocavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aries Global Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. O'Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?