Warner v. Winter
Plaintiff: Ethan J. Warner
Defendant: A. Mark Winter
Case Number: 1:2020cv00496
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/13/2020. (ktt)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by A. Mark Winter of Intention to Seek Summary Judgment for Lack of a Valid Certificate of Merit (Schwartz, Edwin)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin A.D. Schwartz on behalf of A. Mark Winter (Schwartz, Edwin)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethan J. Warner re #1 Complaint (Austin, Sara)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to plaintiff regarding service and Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/27/2020. (ktt)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to A. Mark Winter and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A. Mark Winter ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-5047257), filed by Ethan J. Warner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Mark Winter
Represented By: Edwin A.D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan J. Warner
Represented By: Sara A. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?