Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company v. The Estate of Vicki Irene Starliper et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Defendant: The Estate of Vicki Irene Starliper, Jackson Starliper, Vicki Mentzer and Michael L. Mentzer
Case Number: 1:2020cv00673
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order approving re #10 Stipulation. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/7/2020. (ve)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal (and Release) by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Einsig, Natalie)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael L. Mentzer, The Estate of Vicki Irene Starliper. Michael L. Mentzer waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Baird, Colleen)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael L. Mentzer, The Estate of Vicki Irene Starliper. The Estate of Vicki Irene Starliper waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Baird, Colleen)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen A. Baird on behalf of Michael L. Mentzer, The Estate of Vicki Irene Starliper. (Baird, Colleen)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward E. Knauss, IV on behalf of Jackson Starliper (Knauss, Edward)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Jackson Starliper waiver sent on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Downey, Brian)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/23/2020. (ve)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Einsig, Natalie)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-5073939), filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company v. The Estate of Vicki Irene Starliper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Vicki Irene Starliper
Represented By: Colleen A. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Starliper
Represented By: Edward E. Knauss, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Mentzer
Represented By: Colleen A. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Mentzer
Represented By: Colleen A. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian P. Downey
Represented By: Natalie G. Einsig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?