Bellan v. Capital Blue Cross
Plaintiff: Dawn Bellan
Defendant: Capital Blue Cross
Case Number: 1:2020cv00744
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 14 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Henry A. Platt.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/4/20. (dmn)
June 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Matthew M. Haar on behalf of Capital Blue Cross Attorney Henry Platt is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5110904.. (Haar, Matthew)
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Haar on behalf of Capital Blue Cross (Haar, Matthew)
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory S. Winter on behalf of All Defendants (Winter, Cory)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Dawn Bellan of Filing Additional Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Cruse Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Dawn Bellan of Filing of Additional Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Bellan Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Dawn Bellan of Filing Additional Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Linda Felo Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/19/20. (dmn)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Travis Hedgpeth. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/14/20. (dmn)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jack Siegel.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/14/20. (dmn)
May 14, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott B. Cooper on behalf of Dawn Bellan Attorney Travis Hedgpeth is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5093341., filed by on behalf of Dawn Bellan.(Cooper, Scott)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott B. Cooper on behalf of Dawn Bellan Attorney Jack Siegel is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5093327., filed by on behalf of Dawn Bellan.(Cooper, Scott)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capital Blue Cross and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital Blue Cross ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-5085778), filed by Dawn Bellan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellan v. Capital Blue Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Bellan
Represented By: Scott B. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Blue Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?