Charleau v. S-L Distribution Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Daaveed Charleau
Defendant: S-L Distribution Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00879
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred electronically in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:20-cv-10864 containing 10 electronic documents. (jw)
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred to Middle District of Pennsylvania; Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Kelly, Danielle) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 5/29/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING #8 Joint Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania based on the parties' agreement that a forum-selection clause in a contract underlying the Complaint requires that certain disputes, including the allegations Plaintiff raises here, be litigated in the federal court having jurisdiction over York County, Pennsylvania. The clerk shall promptly transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. (Kelly, Danielle) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 5/29/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. by S-L Distribution Company, LLC.(Engelman, Keri) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 5/29/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed S-L Distribution Company, LLC served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Lichten, Harold) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 5/29/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary L. Rubin on behalf of Daaveed Charleau (Rubin, Zachary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 5/29/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Thomson on behalf of Daaveed Charleau (Thomson, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 5/29/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to S-L Distribution Company, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 5/29/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 5/29/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, Summons to Defendant by Daaveed Charleau. (Lichten, Harold) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 5/29/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against S-L Distribution Company, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8229530 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Daaveed Charleau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Civil Category Form)(Lichten, Harold) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 5/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charleau v. S-L Distribution Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daaveed Charleau
Represented By: Zachary L Rubin
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Matthew W. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S-L Distribution Company, LLC
Represented By: Keri L. Engelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?