Vrabac et al v. S-L Distribution Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Arnes Vrabac and Paul Rocco
Defendant: S-L Distribution Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00937
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 22 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Matthew Thomson on behalf of Arnes Vrabac, Paul Rocco Attorney Matthew Thomson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5117272., filed by on behalf of Arnes Vrabac, Paul Rocco.(Thomson, Matthew)
June 10, 2020 Filing 21 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Zachary L Rubin (eo)
June 10, 2020 Filing 20 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Harold Lichten (eo)
June 10, 2020 Filing 19 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Zachary L Rubin on behalf of Arnes Vrabac, Paul Rocco Attorney Zachary Rubin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5117243., filed by on behalf of Arnes Vrabac, Paul Rocco.(Rubin, Zachary)
June 10, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Harold Lichten and associate counsel bar status verified. (mfa)
June 10, 2020 Filing 18 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Harold L. Lichten on behalf of Arnes Vrabac, Paul Rocco Attorney Harold Lichten is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5117217., filed by on behalf of Arnes Vrabac, Paul Rocco.(Lichten, Harold)
June 10, 2020 Filing 17 Case transferred electronically in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:20-cv-00429 containing electronic documents.
May 29, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER (Doc. #15 ). The Court GRANTS the parties joint motion to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk of Court shall forthwith transfer this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/29/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Transfer to Another District (Middle District of Pennsylvania) by S-L Distribution Company, LLC. (D'Agostino, Michael) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2020 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/17/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR (Doc. #10). The Court GRANTS the motion to appear but notes that a motion was not necessary because an attorney admitted to practice in the District of Connecticut may simply file a notice of appearance. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/17/2020. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 by S-L Distribution Company, LLC. (D'Agostino, Michael) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2020 to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by S-L Distribution Company, LLC. (D'Agostino, Michael) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Appearance of Attorney Michael C. D'Agostino. by S-L Distribution Company, LLC. (D'Agostino, Michael) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arnes Vrabac, Paul Rocco. S-L Distribution Company, LLC served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Rubin, Zachary) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *S-L Distribution Company, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary L. Rubin* *Lichten & Liss-Riordan* *729 Boylston St. Suite 2000* *Boston, MA 02116*. (Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *S-L Distribution Company, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary L. Rubin* *Lichten & Liss-Riordan* *729 Boylston St. Suite 2000* *Boston, MA 02116*. (Freberg, B) Modified on 3/30/2020 (Freberg, B). [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Exhibit filed by Arnes Vrabac, Paul Rocco, #5 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Arnes Vrabac, Paul Rocco. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/27/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/27/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2020; Discovery due by 9/26/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/27/2020.(Freberg, B) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to S-L Distribution Company, LLC. (Rubin, Zachary) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by Paul Rocco, Arnes Vrabac. (Rubin, Zachary) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against S-L Distribution Company, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5774320.), filed by Arnes Vrabac, Paul Rocco.(Rubin, Zachary) [Transferred from Connecticut on 6/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vrabac et al v. S-L Distribution Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnes Vrabac
Represented By: Matthew Thomson
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Zachary L Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Rocco
Represented By: Matthew Thomson
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Zachary L Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S-L Distribution Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?