Lall v. Hoover et al
Plaintiff: Gary Lall
Defendant: Lt. Powell, Reynolds, Simona Flores, Joseph Dunn, L. Francis Cissna, Lt. Probst, Deputy Superintendent Kormanic, Angela Hoover, Jennifer Moon, William Barr and Lt. Gates
Petitioner: Ajarhi Roberts
Case Number: 1:2020cv01018
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Referring Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 TRAVERSE by Gary Lall to #8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(mfa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gary Lall.(mfa)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting petr's mtn for exttm. Pltf shall file a traverse re. his petn #8 on or before 8/28/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 8/3/20. (ma)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Traverse re #8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed) by Gary Lall.(mfa)
July 6, 2020 Receipt of payment from GARY LALL in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 7/2/2020. Receipt number 111025667 processed by bdanilow. (tp)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Lall isORDERED to comply with the scheduling orders previously entered by this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 6, 2020. (kjn)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Gary Lall.(mfa)
June 24, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document # 8 - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - opened as a new civil action 1:20-CV-01063. (kjn)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of PWHC and OSC RECEIVED from USAO. (kjn)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed by Gary Lall.(kjn)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. The clerk is directed to separately file the pleading styled by Lall as a motion for release (Doc. 5), as a petition for writ of habeas corpus by an immigration detainee, and administratively terminate this motion. 2. On or before July 7, 2020, Lall is ORDERED to either pay the $5.00 or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on this habeas corpus petition. 3. In the meanwhile the Clerk is directed to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on the United States Attorney. The respondents shall respond to this petition for writ of habeas corpus onor before July 24,2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 24, 2020. (kjn)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: pre-trial management. 1. On or before July 24, 2020, each individual plaintiff must pay the filing fee prescribed by law, or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. 2. In addition, on or before July 24, 2020 each individual plaintiff must submit a complaint to the court describing that plaintiffs claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 23, 2020. (kjn)
June 22, 2020 VERBAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Carlson. (jw)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Release filed by Gary Lall.(mfa)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by LP on 06/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 NEW PRISONER PACK ATTACHED) (lp)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Joseph Dunn, Simona Flores, Lt. Gates, Angela Hoover, Deputy Superintendent Kormanic, Jennifer Moon, Lt. Powell, Lt. Probst, Reynolds lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Gary Lall.(bg) Modified on 6/22/2020 (bg).
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Application Request for Enlargement of Page Numbers or Words inTRO, filed by Gary Lall.(mfa) Modified on 6/21/2020 (lp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lall v. Hoover et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Powell
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simona Flores
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Dunn
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Probst
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Superintendent Kormanic
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Hoover
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Moon
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Gates
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ajarhi Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?