Scarpato v. Dentsply Sirona, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rachel H. Scarpato
Defendant: Dentsply Sirona, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01223
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Danielle Jean Reid. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/20/2020. (ktt)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Randy Thompson. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/20/2020. (ktt)
August 20, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners Randall Thompson, Danielle Reid and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Danielle Jean Reid on behalf of Dentsply Sirona, Inc. Attorney Danielle Reid is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5213565.. (Reid, Danielle)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Randy Thompson on behalf of Dentsply Sirona, Inc. Attorney Randall Thompson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5213526.. (Thompson, Randy)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 10:45 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(ktt)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Dentsply Sirona, Inc..(Tinari, Christopher)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures - Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/20/2020. (ktt)
July 17, 2020 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Barley Snyder can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Dentsply Sirona, Inc. from York County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-SU-001371. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number APAMDC-5165461), filed by Dentsply Sirona, Inc.(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarpato v. Dentsply Sirona, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dentsply Sirona, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Tinari
Represented By: Randy Thompson
Represented By: Danielle Jean Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel H. Scarpato
Represented By: Justin A. Tomevi
Represented By: Barley Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?