Valora v. Saul
Plaintiff: Armando Valora
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01224
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to SSA, Andrew Saul, Armando Valora YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/25/2020. (kjn)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by George Michael Thiel on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Thiel, George)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed as to the US Attorney on 8/11/2020. (bg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SSA, Andrew Saul and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (kjn)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT / Order Granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Armando Valora. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 17, 2020. (kjn)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals (aaa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Armando Valora.(aaa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Armando Valora. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valora v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: George Michael Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Valora
Represented By: Mark S. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?