Murphy, Jr. v. Smith et al
Petitioner: Kenneth Gary Murphy, Jr.
Respondent: Barry Smith and Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office
Case Number: 1:2020cv01232
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MA
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ELECTION by Barry Smith re #3 Administrative Order with Notice of Limitations of Filing 2254 Petition. (mfa)
July 28, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Received a phone call from Lebanon County Court. They received Plts. copy of Admin Order. Address has been updated and new Admin order sent out this date. (pjr)
July 24, 2020 Receipt of payment from EMILY BERNARD in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 7/23/2020. Receipt number 111025756 processed by aarlidge. (jjs)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER with Notice of Limitations on Filing of Future Petitions Under 28 U.S.C. Section 2254 - AND SO, on this 21st day of July, 2020, in accordance with the foregoing, IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1) Petitioner is directed, within forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order, to complete and return the Notice of Election form attached to this Order indicating Petitioners election to either withdraw his current petition or have the petition construed, and ruled on, under 28 U.S.C. 2254. 2) If Petitioner fails to complete and return the Notice of Election form within the 45-day timeframe, the Court will rule on the current 2254 petition as filed. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/21/20. (dmn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt Number 331), filed by Kenneth Gary Murphy, Jr..(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy, Jr. v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Gary Murphy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?