Oceguera v. Albence et al
Plaintiff: Jose Oceguera
Defendant: David O'Neill, Matthew T. Albence, Donald J. Trump and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv01235
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jose Oceguera stipulation to dismiss with prejudice under fed rule 41 (Pell, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: 1. The Mtn for PI filed by Petr Jose Oceguera #2 is DENIED.2. The TRO #6 issued on 7/17/20 shall be permitted to expire on 7/31/20.3. By or before 8/31/20, Petr shall show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.Signed by Chief Judge John E. Jones, III on 7/29/20. (ma)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Reply Brief to Govt Brief in Opposition To Petitioner's Emergency Motion For Immediate Release filed by Jose Oceguera.(Pell, Daniel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Matthew T. Albence, David O'Neill, Donald J. Trump, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (eo)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Matthew T. Albence, David O'Neill, Donald J. Trump, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence (Concurrence presumed - no response from opposing counsel), #2 Proposed Order)(Sanderson, Joanne)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER 1.The Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Petitioner Jose Oceguera (Doc. 2) is GRANTED to the following extent:a.The Respondents are RESTRAINED and ENJOINED from deporting the Petitioner or relocating him outside of the Middle District of Pennsylvania for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. 2.So that the Court may consider the merits of the Petitioners Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the Respondents shall file a response to the Petitioners Motion by the close of business on Tuesday, July 21, 2020. 3.Petitioner shall file a reply by the close of business on Thursday, July 23, 2020.4.Petitioners counsel shall forthwith serve the United States Attorneys Office for the Middle District of Pennsylvania with the Complaint, Motion and related filings. (eo)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal Document (eo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SEALED PER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (mfa) Modified on 7/17/2020 (eo).
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Jose Oceguera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(mfa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jose Oceguera.(aaa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5167893), filed by Jose Oceguera.(aaa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oceguera v. Albence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Oceguera
Represented By: Daniel M. Pell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David O'Neill
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?